OK HB2343 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2343
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; noncompliance procedures; scope of procedures for enforcement of state tax laws by the Tax Commission; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; noncompliance procedures; scope of procedures for enforcement of state tax laws by the Tax Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Emergency (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on emergency Thompson |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 7 |
2017-04-18 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-17 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-04-11 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-11 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-04-11 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2343 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017