OK HB2338 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2338
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; permitting employees of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections to use state-owned or leased vehicles under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; permitting employees of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections to use state-owned or leased vehicles under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-28 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall |
2021-02-25 | House | Remove Representative Steagall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kendrix |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Steagall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2338 (Carry Over) 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021