OK HB2334 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating the Maternal Mortality Review Act; establishing the Maternal Mortality Review Committee; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating the Maternal Mortality Review Act; establishing the Maternal Mortality Review Committee; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-05-23HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Young
2019-05-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Caldwell (Chad)
2019-05-23HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-23HouseSA's received
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-22SenateTitle restored
2019-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-10SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-03-06HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-05HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2334&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2334%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2334%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2334%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2334%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2334%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2334%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2334_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2334_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback