OK HB2332 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2332
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; transferring the online compulsory insurance verification system from the Department of Public Safety to the Insurance Department; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; transferring the online compulsory insurance verification system from the Department of Public Safety to the Insurance Department; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amended |
2017-02-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2017-02-15 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2332 (Carry Over) 2017-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 7 | 600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 602 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 606 | New Code | See Bill Text |