OK HB2331 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2331
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; Oklahoma Military Department; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; Oklahoma Military Department; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2021-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Steagall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021