OK HB2330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Purchasing procedures; modifying exempt agencies; providing for certain preference to honorably discharged veterans or business entity; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purchasing procedures; modifying exempt agencies; providing for certain preference to honorably discharged veterans or business entity; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
2019-05-15HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Simpson
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-13HouseEmergency restored
2019-05-13HouseTitle restored
2019-05-13HouseRemove Senator Simpson as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Standridge
2019-05-13HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Standridge, Simpson, Haste, Kidd, Dossett, Kirt
2019-04-30HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-03SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-03SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Burns
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2330&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2330%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2330%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2330%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2330%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2330%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2330%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2330%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2330%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2330_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2330_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback