OK HB2330 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; authorizing contracts with third-party vendor to conduct background checks; effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing contracts with third-party vendor to conduct background checks; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 57 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 15 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 57 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 15 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/29/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 27 Nays: 16 | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-23 | CCR read | |
2012-05-23 | To Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Ayes: 49 Nays: 21 | |
2012-05-23 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-23 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Moore | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 29 | |
2012-05-23 | Ayes: 57 Nays: 27 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Title restored | |
2012-05-22 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, SCs named Brown, Aldridge, Treat, Brecheen, Bass, Sparks | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation | |
2012-04-10 | SA's received | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11 | |
2012-04-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-02 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Moore | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |