OK HB2323 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2323
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; health insurance; prohibiting certain health insurers from removing provider from a network for certain reasons; effective date.
Title
Insurance; health insurance; prohibiting certain health insurers from removing provider from a network for certain reasons; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Sen. Warren Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2323 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021