OK HB2322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; asset management; cost-of-living assumption; elected officials; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; asset management; cost-of-living assumption; elected officials; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-16 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 909 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 913 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |