OK HB2317 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; authorizing education and displays regarding traditional winter celebrations; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; authorizing education and displays regarding traditional winter celebrations; effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2014-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2014-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 10
2014-03-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hulbert, Russ
2014-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2014-02-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
2014-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Kern, Bennett, Roberts (Dustin), Turner, Blackwell, Fisher, Nollan
2014-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author)
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Cleveland, Walker, Condit
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7024156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback