OK HB2316 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State government; power of the Governor appointments; effective date.
Title
State government; power of the Governor appointments; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 26 |
2017-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Schulz, Fields, Thompson, Dahm, Simpson, Floyd, Dossett |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 24 |
2017-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-13 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2316 (Carry Over) 2017-05-24 - CCR read
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 4 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 14 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 464 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |