OK HB2315 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2315

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; DRIVE Act; tax rate; reporting; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; DRIVE Act; tax rate; reporting; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11HouseApproved by Governor 05/11/2023
2023-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2023-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2
2023-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2023-04-27HouseSA's received
2023-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2023-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2023-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2023-04-10SenateReported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
2023-04-06SenateReferred to Finance
2023-04-06SenateReported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee
2023-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2023-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-23HouseAuthored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
2023-02-23HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hilbert
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2315 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2315&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2315%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2315%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2315%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2315%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2315%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2315%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2315%20(4-18-23)%20(GOLLIHARE)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2315%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB2315%20CS%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2315%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2315_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2315_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback