OK HB2314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; modifying and expanding auditor duties; audit requirements; effective date.
Title
Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; modifying and expanding auditor duties; audit requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Considered |
2020-03-10 | House | Laid over |
2020-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Townley |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Marti |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2314 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Insurance