OK HB2312 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2312

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; driving on roadways; use of the left-hand lane; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; driving on roadways; use of the left-hand lane; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 18 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseApproved by Governor 05/05/2017
2017-05-01HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-01SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-01HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-27HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-27SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19
2017-04-27SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Public Safety committee
2017-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-03-09SenateCoauthored by Senator Yen
2017-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
2017-03-07HouseAmended
2017-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2017-03-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Caldwell
2017-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-09HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2312 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711309New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback