OK HB2311 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Juvenile Code; adult facilities; youthful offenders; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Juvenile Code; adult facilities; youthful offenders; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-03-08Senatecoauthored by Virgin
2021-03-02SenateCoauthored by Representative Brewer
2021-03-02SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-02HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-01HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2021-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
2021-03-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson
2021-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-09HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2311&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2311%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2311%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2311%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2311%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2311%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2311%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2311%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2311_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2311_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback