OK HB2308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying certain apportionment maximums; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying certain apportionment maximums; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee