OK HB2308 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Vetoed 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Vetoed 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act; modifying powers and duties of the Board; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act; modifying powers and duties of the Board; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Vetoed 04/13/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-04 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 (Secti | New Code | See Bill Text |