OK HB2306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2306
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fees; fees in civil actions; establishing fee for issuance of subpoenas.
Title
Fees; fees in civil actions; establishing fee for issuance of subpoenas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 22 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 22 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2017-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-07 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Kannady |
2017-03-07 | House | Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 31 |
2017-03-07 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Kannady |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 42 |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2017-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2306 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree