OK HB2305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; filing of bonds; providing for filing of claim; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; filing of bonds; providing for filing of claim; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-09HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-05-09HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-22HouseSA's received
2019-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-17SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-03-04HouseAmended
2019-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Frix
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2305&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2305%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2305%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2305%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2305%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2305%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2305%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2305%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2305_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2305_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback