OK HB2300 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; relating to the licensing of certain child care shelters and facilities; relating to the duties of the Commission on Children and Youth; effective date; emergency.
Title
Children; relating to the licensing of certain child care shelters and facilities; relating to the duties of the Commission on Children and Youth; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Wade Rousselot [D] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR read | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | House and Joint Rules suspended | |
2012-05-24 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-24 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2012-05-24 | SCs changed Anderson, Brinkley, Wilson to Treat, David, Ballenger | |
2012-05-24 | Further conference granted | |
2012-05-23 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2012-05-17 | Title restored | |
2012-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-09 | Conference granted, SCs named Crain, Sykes, Anderson, Brinkley, Burrage, Wilson | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2012-04-09 | SA's received | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rousselot, Tibbs, Kern, Nollan | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson, Ownbey | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Peterson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |