OK HB2297 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2297
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; public service corporations; broadband; Internet service providers; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; public service corporations; broadband; Internet service providers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Title restored |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Title stricken |
2021-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2297 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021