OK HB2294 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2294
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying leave benefits; authorizing option for payment of certain leave; effective date.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying leave benefits; authorizing option for payment of certain leave; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Robert Manger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Manger |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bell |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2294 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee