OK HB2290 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2290
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drug and mental health court; expanding parameters of drug court program objectives; effective date.
Title
Drug and mental health court; expanding parameters of drug court program objectives; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Fry, Thompson, Jech, Shaw, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | Remove Representative O'Donnell as principal House author and substitute with Representative Biggs |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2290 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 471 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 471 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 471 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 471 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 471 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 471 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |