OK HB2286 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2286
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; authorizing notification of handgun license expirations to be sent via email; effective date.
Title
Firearms; authorizing notification of handgun license expirations to be sent via email; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp |
2019-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2286 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019