OK HB2281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2281
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying criminal penalties and fines; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying criminal penalties and fines; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] |
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2018-04-17 | House | To Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 3 |
2018-04-17 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rader |
2018-04-12 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | SCs named, naming same conferees |
2018-03-06 | House | Further conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-06 | Senate | CCR rejected, further conference requested |
2018-02-06 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-02-06 | House | To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 17 |
2018-02-06 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-11 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2281 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1541 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1543 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1550 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1550 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 17 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 4 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 4 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |