OK HB2276 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2276
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contracts; Oklahoma Consumer Protection Act; effective date.
Title
Contracts; Oklahoma Consumer Protection Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 |
2017-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, David, Simpson, Bice, Rader, Sparks, Pittman |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-06 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2276 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017