OK HB2273 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; authorizing professional expenses; prior authorization of certain medications; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; authorizing professional expenses; prior authorization of certain medications; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Sen. Al McAffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-01 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-23 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-18 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by McAffrey | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-28 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 6 | |
2012-03-08 | Amended | |
2012-03-08 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Considered | |
2012-03-07 | Laid over | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Cox | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 5030 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5030 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |