OK HB2272 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2272
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; disclosure of financial interest; requiring attestation; monitoring and disciplinary actions; certain inspections within certain time; grace periods; termination of license for failure to provide proof of business operations; effective date; emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; disclosure of financial interest; requiring attestation; monitoring and disciplinary actions; certain inspections within certain time; grace periods; termination of license for failure to provide proof of business operations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by Governor 05/18/2021 |
2021-05-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-14 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 4 |
2021-05-14 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson, Rogers |
2021-05-14 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 34; Ayes: 69 Nays: 21 |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Grego |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, McEntire |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative West (Josh) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2272 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2021