OK HB2262 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property; creating the Freedom to Display the American Flag Act.
Title
Property; creating the Freedom to Display the American Flag Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce and: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan, Ritze, Sherrer |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Roberts (Dustin) |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Commerce and Real Estate Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce and Real Estate |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hoskin |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |