OK HB2259 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2259
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court financial obligations; warrants; cost hearings; ability to pay; effective date.
Title
Court financial obligations; warrants; cost hearings; ability to pay; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2023 |
2023-05-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-10 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 2 |
2023-05-10 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 2 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5 |
2023-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-14 | House | Amended |
2023-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin |
2023-03-14 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Sterling |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2259 (Carry Over) 2023-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2023