OK HB2259 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; insane persons; defining term.
Title
Criminal procedure; insane persons; defining term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Died in conference |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sparks, Sykes, Holt, Crain, Loveless, Newberry, Paddack |
2016-04-26 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2016-03-02 | House | Amended |
2016-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hoskin |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |