OK HB2254 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative rules; Administrative Procedures Act; modifying legislative approval and disapproval of rules; requiring approval of certain rules; effective date.
Title
Administrative rules; Administrative Procedures Act; modifying legislative approval and disapproval of rules; requiring approval of certain rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Died in conference |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Dahm, Holt, Bice, Marlatt, Floyd, Matthews |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules |
2016-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-13 | Senate | coauthored by Allen |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2016-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amended |
2016-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Ritze, Moore |
2016-03-09 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 250 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 303 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 308 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 308 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |