OK HB2250 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; requiring State Auditor and Inspector submit certain data to certain website; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; requiring State Auditor and Inspector submit certain data to certain website; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 9 |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Carry Over) 2017-04-10 - Referred to Appropriations