OK HB2246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2246
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; zero-emission facilities; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; zero-emission facilities; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2246 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - Title stricken