OK HB2246 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Vetoed 06/05/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Vetoed 06/05/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; modifying various provisions of initiative and referendum process; creating the Initiative and Referendum Task Force. Effective date. Emergency
Title
Initiative and referendum; modifying various provisions of initiative and referendum process; creating the Initiative and Referendum Task Force. Effective date. Emergency
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Brogdon [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Rep. Randy Terrill [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Vetoed 06/05/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-20 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-19 | CCR read | |
2009-05-19 | To Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 | |
2009-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Emergency added | |
2009-05-12 | Title restored | |
2009-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-06 | Conference granted, SCs named Brogdon, Nichols, Bingman, Mazzei, Jolley, Lamb | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Terrill, Murphey, Christian, Rousselot, Jackson, Blackwell | |
2009-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-27 | SA's received | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-06 | coauthored by Shumate | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Shumate | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 | |
2009-03-10 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-10 | Amended | |
2009-03-10 | Authored by Senator Brogdon (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Reynolds | |
2009-03-10 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 6 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |