OK HB2244 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; apportionment; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; apportionment; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 56 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: SUSPEND JOINT RULES (Y: 32 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 56 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: SUSPEND JOINT RULES (Y: 32 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 06/01/2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2015-05-20 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 31 |
2015-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2015-05-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 37 |
2015-05-20 | House | JCR adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | Motion to suspend Joint Rule failed |
2015-05-20 | House | General Order |
2015-05-19 | House | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat |
2015-05-15 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2015-05-15 | House | Authored by Representative Sears, Casey |
2015-05-15 | House | First Reading |