OK HB2242 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2242
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utilities; exempting persons determined to be victims of certain crimes from paying initial credit and deposit for utilities; emergency.
Title
Utilities; exempting persons determined to be victims of certain crimes from paying initial credit and deposit for utilities; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 |
2023-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe |
2023-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens |
2023-03-09 | House | General Order |
2023-02-16 | House | Emergency added |
2023-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Utilities |
2023-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Dobrinski |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2242 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023