OK HB2242 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; registration of commercial vehicles; determination of wrecker weight; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; registration of commercial vehicles; determination of wrecker weight; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/29/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-23 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-23 | To Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-21 | Title restored | |
2012-05-21 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2012-05-01 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-11 | SA's received | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | coauthored by Allen | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-21 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |