OK HB2241 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Vetoed 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Vetoed 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Statutes and reports; Administrative Procedures Act; requiring approval of certain rules; effective date.
Title
Statutes and reports; Administrative Procedures Act; requiring approval of certain rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Vetoed 04/13/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-04 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | |
2012-04-04 | coauthored by Sparks | |
2012-04-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Newell | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |