OK HB2239 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; establishing a presumption regarding occupational disease; emergency.
Title
Workers' compensation; establishing a presumption regarding occupational disease; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan May [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2239 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary