OK HB2238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2238
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; allowing for soliciting rides or businesses; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; allowing for soliciting rides or businesses; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan May [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021