OK HB2238 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' Compensation; Workers' Compensation funds; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation; Workers' Compensation funds; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 06/01/2015
2015-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2015-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
2015-05-22SenateJCR adopted
2015-05-21SenateDirect to Calendar
2015-05-20SenateFirst Reading
2015-05-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-05-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-05-20HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2015-05-20HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3; Ayes: 70 Nays: 22
2015-05-20HouseJCR adopted
2015-05-20HouseGeneral Order
2015-05-20HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2015-05-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2015-05-13HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Treat
2015-05-13HouseAuthored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2015-05-13HouseAuthored by Representative Sears, Casey
2015-05-13HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
85A281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
85A4011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback