OK HB2236 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sunset; Oklahoma Educational Television Authority; re-creating Authority; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; Oklahoma Educational Television Authority; re-creating Authority; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 22 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 22 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2012 | |
2012-05-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 28 | |
2012-05-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2012-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-26 | Failed in Committee - General Government | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Aldridge (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |