OK HB2226 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unclaimed property; recovery fee for deceased claimant; contract date; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed property; recovery fee for deceased claimant; contract date; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseApproved by Governor 04/28/2021
2021-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-21SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
2021-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-06SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-03HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-02HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2021-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-17HouseAuthored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
2021-02-17HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Moore
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2226&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2226%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2226%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2226%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2226%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2226%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2226%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2226%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2226_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2226_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback