OK HB2216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; requiring contracted hospital or inpatient facility to provide certain notice to enrollee; notice, estimate and disclosure by noncontracted providers; effective date.
Title
Insurance; requiring contracted hospital or inpatient facility to provide certain notice to enrollee; notice, estimate and disclosure by noncontracted providers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2216 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance