OK HB2189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2189
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Roads and bridges; the Jennifer Lea Briggs and Heather Wilson Memorial Highway; the Keith Alan Copeland Memorial Bridge; requiring permanent markers; effective date.
Title
Roads and bridges; the Jennifer Lea Briggs and Heather Wilson Memorial Highway; the Keith Alan Copeland Memorial Bridge; requiring permanent markers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2189 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |