OK HB2188 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Torts; access to medical records; modifying certain fees and procedures for parties requesting medical records; effective date.
Title
Torts; access to medical records; modifying certain fees and procedures for parties requesting medical records; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Approved by Governor 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-07 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 7 |
2013-05-07 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 21 |
2013-02-27 | House | Amended |
2013-02-27 | House | General Order |
2013-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Schwartz |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |