OK HB2184 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; permitted Chief Medical Examiner to equip certain vehicles with flashing lights and sirens and to permit certain vehicles to exceed maximum speed limits; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; permitted Chief Medical Examiner to equip certain vehicles with flashing lights and sirens and to permit certain vehicles to exceed maximum speed limits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Barrington, Sykes, Treat, Marlatt, Smalley, Wyrick, Floyd |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2015-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |