OK HB2182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2182
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing the towing of certain unattended vehicles; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing the towing of certain unattended vehicles; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Johns |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2182 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021