OK HB2180 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2180
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Payroll deductions; removing requirement for making payroll deductions for certain insurance premiums; effective date.
Title
Payroll deductions; removing requirement for making payroll deductions for certain insurance premiums; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 12 |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Johns |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2180 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021